Archive for 2023
-
Past And Present Governors Of Cross River State
South-Eastern State Title Assumed office Left office Party Uduokaha Esuene Governor 28 May 1967 July 1975 Military Paul Omu Governor 3 February 1976 July 1978 Military Cross River State Title […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Borno State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Musa Usman Governor 28 May 1967 July 1975 Military Muhammadu Buhari Governor July 1975 March 1976 Military Group Captain Mustapha A. Amin Governor March […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Benue State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Abdullahi Shelleng Governor March 1976 July 1978 Military Adebayo Lawal Governor July 1978 October 1979 Military Aper Aku Governor October 1979 December 1983 […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Bayelsa State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Phillip Ayeni Administrator 7 October 1996 28 February 1997 Military Habu Daura Administrator 28 February 1997 27 June 1997 Military Omoniyi Caleb Olubolade […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Bauchi State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Mohammad Bello Khaliel Governor March 1976 July 1978 Military Garba Duba Governor July 1978 October 1979 Military Abubakar Tatari Ali Governor October 1979 […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Anambra State
No Name Title Assumed office Left office Party 1 John Atom Kpera Governor March 1976 July 1978 Military 2 Col. Datti Sadiq Abubakar Governor July 1978 October 1979 Military 3 Jim […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Akwa Ibom State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Tunde Ogbeha Administrator 28 September 1987 30 July 1988 Military Godwin Abbe Administrator 31 July 1988 5 September 1990 Military Idongesit Nkanga Administrator […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Adamawa State
Name Title Assumed office Left office Party Abubakar Saleh Michika Governor 2 January 1992 17 November 1993 NRC Gregory Agboneni Administrator 9 December 1993 14 September 1994 (Military) Com. Yohanna […]
-
Past And Present Governors Of Abia State
Name Title Assumed office Exit office Party Frank Ajobena Military Administrator August 28, 1991 January, 1992 None Ogbonnaya Onu Executive Governor January, 1992 November, 1993 NRC Chinyere Ike Nwosu Military […]